Grist v. Travis County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Toby Grist
Defendant: Travis County, Texas, Alexander Antillon, Anthony Cardinal, Antonio Serna, James Thomas, Osvaldo Hernandez and Richard Martinez
Case Number: 1:2021cv00886
Filed: October 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Response to Motion, by Alexander Antillon, Anthony Cardinal, Osvaldo Hernandez, Richard Martinez, Antonio Serna, James Thomas, Travis County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Anthony)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Toby Grist, re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Travis County, Texas, Defendant Antonio Serna, Defendant Anthony Cardinal, Defendant Osvaldo Hernandez, Defendant James Thomas, Defendant Alexander Antillon, Defendant Richard Martinez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DENYING DE FENDANT COUNTYS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Gale, Christopher)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Gale on behalf of Toby Grist. Attorney Christopher J. Gale added to party Toby Grist(pty:pla) (Gale, Christopher)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Toby Grist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance Pro Se by Toby Grist. (dm)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Alexander Antillon, Anthony Cardinal, Osvaldo Hernandez, Richard Martinez, Antonio Serna, James Thomas, Travis County, Texas.(Nelson, Anthony)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alexander Antillon, Anthony Cardinal, Osvaldo Hernandez, Richard Martinez, Antonio Serna, James Thomas, Travis County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pope, Patrick)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the removing party to supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Directing Frank R. Hughes III to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
October 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 3, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (dl)
October 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Thomas, Alexander Antillon, Osvaldo Hernandez, Travis County, Texas, Richard Martinez, Anthony Cardinal, Antonio Serna (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15290671), filed by James Thomas, Alexander Antillon, Osvaldo Hernandez, Travis County, Texas, Richard Martinez, Anthony Cardinal, Antonio Serna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Citations, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to JS-44)(Nelson, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grist v. Travis County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Grist
Represented By: Frank R. Hughes, III
Represented By: Christopher J. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis County, Texas
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Antillon
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cardinal
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Serna
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osvaldo Hernandez
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Martinez
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?