LaPoint v. Western Care, Inc
Plaintiff: Keisha M. LaPoint
Defendant: Western Care, Inc and Western Care, Inc doing business as Amada Senior Care Austin
Case Number: 1:2022cv00101
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 9/30/2022 03:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Western Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Report)(Temple, Mark)
May 6, 2022 The Clerk notes that a Proposed Scheduling Order was filed as Exhibit A to Dkt. #9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan. These documents should have been filed separately. No additional action will be required at this time. Please take note for future filing purposes. (jv2)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Western Care, Inc. (Temple, Mark)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Western Care, Inc.(Temple, Mark)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Original Collective Action Complaint; Western Care, Inc answer due 3/17/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint by Western Care, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keisha M. LaPoint. Western Care, Inc served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Prieto, Ricardo)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Western Care, Inc. (dm)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Keisha M. LaPoint. (Prieto, Ricardo)
February 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
February 7, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn)
February 7, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keisha M. LaPoint. (rn)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15688779), filed by Keisha M. LaPoint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LaPoint Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prieto, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPoint v. Western Care, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha M. LaPoint
Represented By: Ricardo Jose Prieto
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Care, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Care, Inc doing business as Amada Senior Care Austin
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Represented By: Peter J. Stuhldreher
Represented By: Emil Sadykhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?