Ramos v. Torres
Plaintiff: Joey Ramos
Defendant: Daniel Torres, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00235
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joey Ramos. Daniel Torres, Jr served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022. (dm)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joey Ramos. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Torres, Jr. (dm)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Parties by Joey Ramos. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joey Ramos. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT, filed by Joey Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dm)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
March 23, 2022 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER (dated 2/21/2022) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (jv2)
March 14, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
March 14, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (rn)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joey Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Strickland, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Ramos
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Torres, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?