Stringfellow v. Federal Reserve Board
Plaintiff: Steven J. Stringfellow
Defendant: Federal Reserve Board and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv00341
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Susan Hightower
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 Request for a Waiver of Diplomatic Immunity by Steven J. Stringfellow. (jv2)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order and #4 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge by Steven J. Stringfellow. (jv2)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #4 Order and Report and Recommendation, as to Steven J. Stringfellow. (jv2)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt for copy of of #4 Order and Report and Recommendation mailed to Steven Stringfellow via U.S. certified mail. (jv2)
May 9, 2022 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (jv2)
May 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the United States Magistrate Judge re #1 Complaint and #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven J. Stringfellow. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff in forma pauperis status. Service on the Defendant shall be withheld pending the District Court's review of the report and recommendations.Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (jv2)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER (dated 2/21/2020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (dl)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven J. Stringfellow. (dl)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Steven J. Stringfellow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dl)
April 4, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
April 4, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stringfellow v. Federal Reserve Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Stringfellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?