Little et al v. Llano County et al
Plaintiff: Leila Green Little, Jeanne Puryear, Kathy Kennedy, Rebecca Jones, Richard Day, Cynthia Waring and Diane Moster
Defendant: Llano County, Ron Cunningham, Jerry Don Moss, Peter Jones, Mike Sandoval, Linda Raschke, Amber Milum, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells, Rhoda Schneider and Gay Baskin
Petitioner: State of Texas
Case Number: 1:2022cv00424
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring, re #41 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant State of Texas (Leonida, Ellen)
June 22, 2022 Filing 46 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonida, Ellen)
June 15, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells. Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Gay Baskin(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Ron Cunningham(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Peter Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Llano County(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Amber Milum(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Jerry Don Moss(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Linda Raschke(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Mike Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Rhoda Schneider(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Bonnie Wallace(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Rochelle Wells(pty:dft) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
June 15, 2022 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, State of Texas, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells, re #43 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Leila Green Little, Plaintiff Kathy Kennedy, Plaintiff Jeanne Puryear, Plaintiff Cynthia Waring, Plaintiff Richard Day, Plaintiff Rebecca Jones, Plaintiff Diane Moster (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rienstra, Matthew)
June 14, 2022 Filing 43 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leonida, Ellen)
June 8, 2022 Filing 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Little, et al, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, State of Texas, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rienstra, Matthew)
June 8, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Intervene by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wade, Landon)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #39 Joint Notice. #23 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Discovery is rendered MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the hearing set for 06/08/2022 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
June 7, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE Joint Notice by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring re #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Leonida, Ellen)
June 6, 2022 Filing 37 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 19, 2022, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/27/2022, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2022, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2022, (lr)
June 6, 2022 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring, re #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Leila Green Little, Plaintiff Kathy Kennedy, Plaintiff Jeanne Puryear, Plaintiff Cynthia Waring, Plaintiff Richard Day, Plaintiff Rebecca Jones, Plaintiff Diane Moster (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Salomon, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Salomon Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Salomon Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Salomon Declaration)(Leonida, Ellen)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Hearing on #23 MOTION for Expedited Discovery: Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mark Lane. The parties are ordered to file a Joint Notice by 6/7/2022 identifying resolved and remaining outstanding issues. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #23 Motion to Expedite entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Expedite, (Dkt. 23), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jalc)
June 2, 2022 MOTION REFERRED: referred #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (jv2)
June 1, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells, re #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Leila Green Little, Plaintiff Kathy Kennedy, Plaintiff Jeanne Puryear, Plaintiff Cynthia Waring, Plaintiff Richard Day, Plaintiff Rebecca Jones, Plaintiff Diane Moster (Rienstra, Matthew)
May 20, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gay Baskin answer due 6/8/2022; Ron Cunningham answer due 6/8/2022; Peter Jones answer due 6/8/2022; Llano County answer due 6/8/2022; Amber Milum answer due 6/8/2022; Jerry Don Moss answer due 6/8/2022; Linda Raschke answer due 6/8/2022; Mike Sandoval answer due 6/8/2022; Rhoda Schneider answer due 6/8/2022; Bonnie Wallace answer due 6/8/2022; Rochelle Wells answer due 6/8/2022. (jv2)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jalc)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before June 8, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jalc)
May 19, 2022 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Little, et al by Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rienstra, Matthew) Modified on 5/19/2022 (jv2).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
May 19, 2022 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 5/19/2022. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(jv2)
May 18, 2022 Filing 29 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #28 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Leila Green Little, et al Incorrect case number or case style listed on document filed.Remarks: Please refile the motion with the correct style/case number. (jv2)
May 18, 2022 Filing 28 DEFICIENT PLEADING Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Leila Green Little, et al by Gay Baskin, Ron Cunningham, Peter Jones, Llano County, Amber Milum, Jerry Don Moss, Linda Raschke, Mike Sandoval, Rhoda Schneider, Bonnie Wallace, Rochelle Wells. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rienstra, Matthew) Modified on 5/18/2022 (jv2).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING Telephone Conference for 5/19/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
May 13, 2022 Filing 26 Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging. (USB drive uploaded to the T-drive) (cc3)
May 12, 2022 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT to #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice Regarding Amended Certificate of Service by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Certificate of Service)(Leonida, Ellen)
May 12, 2022 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Notice Regarding Amended Certificate of Service by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Certificate of Service)(Leonida, Ellen)
May 11, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Leonida, Ellen)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Pratik Ghosh. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Sarah Salomon. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Matthew Borden. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Jonas Noah Hagey. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Ellen V. Leonida. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Amy Senia. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 9, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #12 Proposed Order)(Botkin, Ryan)
May 5, 2022 Filing 21 Transfer Letter sent to all counsel. (dl)
May 5, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Leila Green Little, Cynthia Waring, Kathy Kennedy, Rebecca Jones, Richard Day. All Defendants. (Chiarello, Katherine)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER--IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this case be TRANSFERRED to the Austin Division of the Western Division of Texas. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
May 5, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
May 5, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGEINITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALSTO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 5, 2022 Case transferred in from San Antonio Division on 05/05/2022 Case Number 5:22-cv-400., filed by Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Leila Green Little, Cynthia Waring, Kathy Kennedy, Rebecca Jones, Richard Day.(dl)
May 4, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's April 28, 2022 Order Regarding Transfer of Venue to the Austin Division to #17 Order,, Set Hearings, by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER--The Court hereby provides the parties the opportunity to present any appropriate motion, briefing, and opportunity for hearing on the issue whether transfer of venue to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas is proper. Any motion or briefing by either party shall be filed on or before Monday, May 9, 2022, ( Miscellaneous Hearing set for 5/13/2022 9:00 AM before Judge Jason K. Pulliam,). Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (nm)
April 27, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Sarah Salomon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969644) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Pratik Ghosh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969636) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Matthew Borden ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969632) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Jonas Noah Hagey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969629) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Ellen V. Leonida ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969615) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katherine Patrice Chiarello for Amy Senia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15969596) by on behalf of Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Botkin, Ryan)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Amy Senia. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Pratik Ghosh. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Sarah Salomon. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to J. Noah Hagey. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Matthew Borden. (nm)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Ellen V. Leonida. (nm)
April 26, 2022 DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***SPOKE TO COUNSEL AND ADVISED THAT INDIVIDUAL SUMMONSES NEED TO BE DONE FOR EACH DEFENDANT*** re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, (nm)
April 25, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (nm)
April 25, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (nm)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT-ADVISED COUNSEL THAT INDIVIDUAL SUMMONSES NEED TO BE DONE FOR EACH DEFENDANT***REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Richard Day, Rebecca Jones, Kathy Kennedy, Leila Green Little, Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Cynthia Waring. (Chiarello, Katherine) Modified on 4/26/2022 (nm).
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15959827), filed by Diane Moster, Jeanne Puryear, Leila Green Little, Cynthia Waring, Kathy Kennedy, Rebecca Jones, Richard Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chiarello, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little et al v. Llano County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Green Little
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Puryear
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Kennedy
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Jones
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Day
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Waring
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Moster
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Ryan A. Botkin
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: Amy Senia
Represented By: Ellen V. Leonida
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Kayna Stavast Levy
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Llano County
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Cunningham
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Don Moss
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Jones
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sandoval
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Raschke
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Milum
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Wallace
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Wells
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhoda Schneider
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gay Baskin
Represented By: Dwain K. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew L. Rienstra
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Texas
Represented By: Landon Allen Wade
Represented By: Leif A. Olson
Represented By: Todd A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?