Roman v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division
Plaintiff: Mikel David Roman, Sr. and David Eugene McIntyre
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division
Case Number: 1:2022cv00553
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 Letter/Correspondence from David Eugene McIntyre (cc3)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff either pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 07/13/2022. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(jv2)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Mikel David Roman. (dl)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER (dated 2/21/12020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (FEE IS DUE), filed by Mikel David Roman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dl)
June 3, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 3, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel David Roman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eugene McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice Institutional Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?