Hambleton v. Capital One, N.A.
Defendant: mark alan hambleton and Capital One, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00707
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Alan Hambleton (pg)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Order (requiring supplementation of state court record) by Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Case Summary/Docket), #2 Exhibit 2 (Civil Citation and Affidavit of Service))(Herrold, David)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Herrold, David)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement therecord with state court pleadings.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (rn)
July 15, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (rn)
July 15, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted at Removal by Capital One, N.A.. (Herrold, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/18/2022 to flatten image) (rn).
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Capital One, N.A.. (Herrold, David)
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Capital One, N.A.. (Herrold, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/18/2022 to flatten image) (rn).
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Capital One, N.A. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-16263226), filed by Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Registry and Pleadings))(Herrold, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hambleton v. Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mark alan hambleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: David H. Herrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?