Ruiz v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Irene C Ruiz and Irene C. Ruiz
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00771
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in California Northern District as case number 3:22-cv-04716. (jv2)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 364) entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.(jv2)
August 4, 2022 Filing 4 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Irene C Ruiz. (Hendler, Scott) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/4/2022 to flatten document) (rn).
August 4, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jv2)
August 4, 2022 Notice of Correction: re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. This filing includes a fillable form. Fillable Forms must be flattened to permanently affix any signatures, or other items added to the document to include the case style, party names, dates, etc. These steps should be performed prior to filing your documents through CM/ECF. Instructions are on the Courts website on the CM/ECF page under Training, Printing to PDF. The Clerks Office has flattened this form. No further action required. Please take note for future filing purposes. (jv2)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Irene C Ruiz. (Hendler, Scott) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (jv2).
August 1, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
August 1, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16332440). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Irene C Ruiz.(Hendler, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene C Ruiz
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene C. Ruiz
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?