Mayfield et al v. U.S. Department of Labor et al
Plaintiff: Robert Mayfield and R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor and Martin Walsh
Case Number: 1:2022cv00792
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Kerkhoff for Robert Mayfield and for R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin E. Wilcox for John Kerkhoff ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16565636) by on behalf of Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilcox, Erin) Modified on 9/26/2022 (jv2).
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Wake, Luke)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Wake, Luke)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. U.S. Department of Labor served on 8/15/2022, answer due 10/14/2022; Martin Walsh served on 8/15/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Wake, Luke)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Luke Wake for Robert Mayfield and R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn)
August 10, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin E. Wilcox for Luke Wake ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16379656) by on behalf of Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilcox, Erin) Modified on 8/15/2022 (jv2).
August 9, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
August 9, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (rn)
August 9, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Wilcox, Erin)
August 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16373323), filed by Robert Mayfield, R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W)(Wilcox, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield et al v. U.S. Department of Labor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mayfield
Represented By: John Kerkhoff
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Erin E. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.U.M. Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John Kerkhoff
Represented By: Luke A. Wake
Represented By: Erin E. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?