Wen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Huajun Wen
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00940
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Linda)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Linda G. Moore added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Moore, Linda)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huajun Wen as to Huajun Wen. Waiver sent on 9/16/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. (Roach, Lonnie)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16531796). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Huajun Wen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie)
September 16, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (jv2)
September 16, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jv2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wen v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huajun Wen
Represented By: Lonnie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?