Yarbrough v. Rosalez
Petitioner: Jimmy Don Yarbrough
Respondent: Warden FNU Rosalez
Case Number: 1:2022cv01138
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Susan Hightower
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt of #8 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (pg)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jimmy Don Yarbrough. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number 641 (rn)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Don Yarbrough.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Petitioner shall within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order, submit either the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2022: #1 IFP Application) (jv2).
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter. (jv2)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (dated 08/11/2016) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jimmy Don Yarbrough (No Filing Fee submitted). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv2)
November 3, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jv2)
November 3, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (jv2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough v. Rosalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Don Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden FNU Rosalez
Represented By: Mary F. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?