United States of America v. Chodniewicz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joshua Chodniewicz, Natalie D. Chodniewicz and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01151
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ord Mtn Withdraw)(Harris, Shawnika)
December 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant's Original Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Harris, Shawnika) Modified on 12/27/2022 (jv2).
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Shawnika L. Harris added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Harris, Shawnika)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Humeniuk, Stephen)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Stephen J. Humeniuk added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Humeniuk, Stephen)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Yepuri, Moha)
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Natalie D. Chodniewicz served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Yepuri, Moha)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Joshua Chodniewicz served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. (Yepuri, Moha)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rn)
November 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
November 7, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (rn)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Yepuri, Moha)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yepuri, Moha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Chodniewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Moha P. Yepuri
Represented By: Moha M. Pradhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Chodniewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie D. Chodniewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Shawnika LaShone Brooks
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Stephen J. Humeniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?