United States of America v. Kalbas et al
Plaintiff: United States of America (Internal Revenue Service) and United States of America
Defendant: James C Kalbas, Byron J Kalbas, James C. Kalbas and Byron J. Kalbas
Case Number: 1:2024cv00239
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued as to Byron J. Kalbas (cc3)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT issued as to James C. Kalbas (cc3)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 AGREED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment Signed by All Parties)(Sobotka, Andrew)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Byron J. Kalbas served on 3/6/2024, answer due 3/27/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. James C. Kalbas served on 3/6/2024, answer due 3/27/2024. (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Byron J. Kalbas, James C. Kalbas. (kp)
March 5, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
March 5, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
March 5, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (Sobotka, Andrew)
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sobotka, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kalbas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Represented By: Andrew L. Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew L. Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Kalbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron J Kalbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Kalbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron J. Kalbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?