Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. v. W. Kenneth Paxton et al
Plaintiff: Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.
Defendant: W. Kenneth Paxton and Jane Nelson
Case Number: 1:2024cv00472
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #20 Memorandum in Support by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Martens, Matthew)
June 27, 2024 Filing 22 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc., re #15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant W. Kenneth Paxton (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Matthew T. Martens in Support)(Martens, Matthew)
June 27, 2024 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by W. Kenneth Paxton, re #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKenney, Jason)
June 20, 2024 Filing 20 Proposed Undisputed Facts in Support of #15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment #16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by W. Kenneth Paxton. (pg)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the lack of opposition, this motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Defendant Paxton's Proposed Undisputed Facts, (Dkt. 19-1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
June 10, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Proposed Undisputed Facts Nunc Pro Tunc by W. Kenneth Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Undisputed Facts, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKenney, Jason)
June 6, 2024 Filing 18 APPENDIX to #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew T. Martens, #2 Exhibit 1 of Martens Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 of Martens Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 of Martens Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 of Martens Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 of Martens Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 of Martens Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 of Martens Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 of Martens Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 of Martens Decl., #11 Declaration of Justin Welner, #12 Exhibit 1 of Welner Decl.)(Martens, Matthew)
June 6, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martens, Matthew). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 6/7/2024 (pg).
June 6, 2024 Filing 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by W. Kenneth Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(McKenney, Jason)
June 6, 2024 Filing 15 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by W. Kenneth Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKenney, Jason)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Page Limits and Deadlines for Motions for Summary Judgment and Responses entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED: (1) that the default 20-page limit applicable to each partys motion for summary judgment is enlarged by 5 additional pages to 25 pages in total; (2) that the default 20-page limit applicable to each party's opposition brief is enlarged by the same amount; and (3) that the 14-day default time-period for filing opposition briefs to each other's motion for summary judgment be extended to 21 days. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
May 29, 2024 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion for Enlargement of Page Limits and Deadlines for Motions for Summary Judgment and Responses by W. Kenneth Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Joint Motion Enlargement of Page Limits)(McKenney, Jason)
May 17, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (McCarty, Darren)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jaclyn N. Moyer for Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew T. Martens for Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
May 7, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by W. Kenneth Paxton as to W. Kenneth Paxton. Waiver sent on 5/2/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (McKenney, Jason)
May 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C. McKenney on behalf of W. Kenneth Paxton. Attorney Jason C. McKenney added to party W. Kenneth Paxton(pty:dft) (McKenney, Jason)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jane Nelson, W. Kenneth Paxton. (kp)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Salvatore, Gerard)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, the requested summons cannot be issued because you listed multiple defendants on the same summons. Each defendant is issued a separate summons. Please resubmit your request with one summons per defendant. You may include multiple summonses within a single PDF document/request. (kp)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren L. McCarty Jaclyn N. Moyer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18721085) by on behalf of Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (McCarty, Darren)
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren L. McCarty Matthew Martens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18721045) by on behalf of Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (McCarty, Darren)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Salvatore, Gerard)
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. for Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Salvatore, Gerard)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18716709), filed by Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salvatore, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spirit AeroSystems, Inc. v. W. Kenneth Paxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit AeroSystems, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard A. Salvatore
Represented By: Darren L. McCarty
Represented By: Jaclyn N. Moyer
Represented By: Matthew T. Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kenneth Paxton
Represented By: Jason C. McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?