Berkman v. The Short Term Disability Income Plan for the Employees of IGT et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Berkman
Defendant: The Short Term Disability Income Plan for the Employees of IGT
Case Number: 1:2024cv00516
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TERMINATING defendant Life Insurance Company of North America terminated. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
July 10, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jeffrey Berkman. (Roach, Lonnie)
July 10, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Jeffrey Berkman (Roach, Lonnie)
June 21, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Berkman as to The Short Term Disability Income Plan for the Employees of IGT. Waiver sent on 5/15/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Roach, Lonnie)
June 5, 2024 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Berkman as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Waiver sent on 5/15/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Roach, Lonnie)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18765262). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jeffrey Berkman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie)
May 15, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
May 15, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkman v. The Short Term Disability Income Plan for the Employees of IGT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Berkman
Represented By: Lonnie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Short Term Disability Income Plan for the Employees of IGT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?