Lafta v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Ahmad Lafta
Defendant: State of Texas, Heman Marion Sweatt, Roscoe Properties, Travis County and Miranda McArthur
Case Number: 1:2024cv00527
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt as to AHMAD LAFTA of #9 Order on Motion to Reopen Case. (cc3)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Reopen Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED #5 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and #6 Final Judgment are VACATED. Plaintiff shall file his Objections to the R&R before 8/5/24. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
July 3, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Reopen Case by Ahmad Lafta. (pg)
June 26, 2024 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #6 Judgment, #5 Order as to Ahmad Lafta. (pg)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 7/10/2024*** FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) Modified on 7/10/2024 (cc3).
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 7/10/2024*** ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's complaint, (Dkt. #1 ), is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) Modified on 7/10/2024 (cc3).
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Dkt. #2 ). This Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the District Court DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's lawsuit under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER (dated 02/21/2020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (cr5)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ahmad Lafta. (cr5)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP PENDING), filed by Ahmad Lafta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cr5)
May 16, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
May 16, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ahmad Lafta. (cr5)
May 16, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (cr5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafta v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Lafta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heman Marion Sweatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roscoe Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miranda McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?