Austin Neurospine, PLLC v. Aetna Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Austin Neurospine, PLLC
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc. and Aetna
Case Number: 1:2024cv00672
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal - ERISA
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #6 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the amended complaint, (Dkt. 11), this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
August 6, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Austin Neurospine, PLLC.(Payne, Christopher)
August 6, 2024 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Austin Neurospine, PLLC, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Aetna Health Inc., Defendant Aetna, Defendant Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Payne, Christopher)
August 1, 2024 Filing 9 Letter to Christopher C. Miller regarding mandatory ECF Registration. (cnr)
July 31, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher B. Payne (Payne, Christopher)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before August 6, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
July 30, 2024 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Austin Neurospine, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Payne, Christopher)
July 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOOT per Text Order dated 08/07/2024 MOTION to Dismiss by Aetna, Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc., Aetna Health Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Herman, Jonathan) Modified on 8/7/2024 (pg).
June 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 16, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlc)
June 24, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna, Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc., Aetna Health Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Jonathan)
June 20, 2024 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #2 Deficiency Notice, Supplement to JS44 Civil Cover sheet by Aetna, Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc., Aetna Health Inc.. (Herman, Jonathan)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
June 20, 2024 Filing 2 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
June 18, 2024 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
June 18, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Austin Neurospine, PLLC. (kp)
June 18, 2024 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
June 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AETNA Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18891458), filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 Exhibit State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit Citation and Return of Service, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Health Plans, #7 Affidavit)(Herman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Neurospine, PLLC v. Aetna Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc.
Represented By: Charles W. Hill
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Better Health of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W. Hill
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna
Represented By: Charles W. Hill
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Neurospine, PLLC
Represented By: Christopher C. Miller
Represented By: Christopher B. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?