Keller Williams Realty, Inc. v. InsideRE LLC
Plaintiff: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Defendant: InsideRE LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00074
Filed: January 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2025 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. as to InsideRE LLC. Waiver sent on 2/11/2025, answer due 4/14/2025. (Ghavimi, Darlene)
January 16, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to InsideRE LLC. (kp)
January 15, 2025 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
January 15, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
January 15, 2025 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (kp)
January 15, 2025 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Mesher, Stewart)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mesher, Stewart)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Mesher, Stewart)
January 15, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19673114), filed by KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Mesher, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller Williams Realty, Inc. v. InsideRE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InsideRE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart Mesher
Represented By: Darlene Ghavimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?