MasterScapes, Inc. et al v. Mirelez et al
Plaintiff: MasterScapes, Inc., Daniel Haught and Catherine Haught
Defendant: Gustavo Mirelez and Texas Master Scapes LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00080
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS REPORT ORDER; due on or before 3/26/2025. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
January 29, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MasterScapes, Inc., Catherine Haught, Daniel Haught. Texas Master Scapes LLC served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Cone, John)
January 29, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MasterScapes, Inc., Catherine Haught, Daniel Haught. Gustavo Mirelez served on 1/23/2025, answer due 2/13/2025. (Cone, John)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MICHAEL DVOREN. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John M. Cone for Michael Dvoren ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19705238) by on behalf of MasterScapes, Inc., Daniel Haught, Catherine Haught. (Cone, John)
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gustavo Mirelez, Texas Master Scapes LLC. (kp)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cone, John)
January 16, 2025 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
January 16, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
January 16, 2025 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MasterScapes, Inc., Daniel Haught, Catherine Haught. (kp)
January 16, 2025 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MasterScapes, Inc., Daniel Haught, Catherine Haught. (Cone, John)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MasterScapes, Inc., Daniel Haught, Catherine Haught. (Cone, John)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19678407), filed by MasterScapes, Inc., Catherine Haught, Daniel Haught. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cone, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MasterScapes, Inc. et al v. Mirelez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MasterScapes, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Cone
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Haught
Represented By: John M. Cone
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Haught
Represented By: John M. Cone
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Mirelez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Master Scapes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?