Wallace et al v. Lively
Plaintiff: Jed Wallace and Street Relations, Inc.
Defendant: Blake Lively
Case Number: 1:2025cv00163
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2025 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Laura Prather: re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation . As of 7/28/20 when filing a motion for leave to exceed page limitations in the Austin Division, the document that exceeds the page limit must be attached to the motion. Please re-docket the motion for leave to exceed page limitations and include the document and a proposed order as attachments. The document exceeding page limits will be added to the docket by the Clerks Office if the Court grants the motion for leave .(cnr)
March 27, 2025 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Blake Lively. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to File Motion in Excess of 20 Pages)(Prather, Laura)
March 6, 2025 Reset Deadline: Blake Lively answer due 4/4/2025. (cnr)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Defamation is extended from March 10, 2025 to April 4, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KClc)
March 5, 2025 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Blake Lively. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Prather, Laura)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order on Agreed Motion to Correct Docket Entry No. #11 . Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cnr)
February 28, 2025 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Summons Returned Executed by Street Relations, Inc., Jed Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt)
February 28, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Christof Butzer on behalf of Street Relations, Inc., Jed Wallace. Attorney Carl Christof Butzer added to party Street Relations, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Carl Christof Butzer added to party Jed Wallace(pty:pla) (Butzer, Carl)
February 26, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc.. Blake Lively served on 2/15/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Dow, Matt)
February 10, 2025 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Lively as to Blake Lively. Waiver sent on 2/5/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Prather, Laura)
February 7, 2025 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Blake Lively. (pg)
February 6, 2025 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc.. (Dow, Matt)
February 5, 2025 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Street Relations, Inc.. (Carmona, Katharine)
February 5, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cody Lee Vaughn on behalf of Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc. (Vaughn, Cody)
February 5, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katharine L. Carmona on behalf of Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc. (Carmona, Katharine)
February 5, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matt Dow on behalf of Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc. (Dow, Matt)
February 5, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel R. Glover on behalf of Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc. (Glover, Joel)
February 5, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L. Babcock on behalf of Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
February 4, 2025 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
February 4, 2025 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc.. (kp)
February 4, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
February 4, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Jed Wallace et al. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19749688), filed by Jed Wallace, Street Relations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (CRD Complaint), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Precursor), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Right to Sue Letter), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Elle Magazine Article), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaughn, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace et al v. Lively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jed Wallace
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Katharine L. Carmona
Represented By: Joel R. Glover
Represented By: Cody Lee Vaughn
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Represented By: Carl Christof Butzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Street Relations, Inc.
Represented By: Matt Dow
Represented By: Katharine L. Carmona
Represented By: Joel R. Glover
Represented By: Cody Lee Vaughn
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Represented By: Carl Christof Butzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Lively
Represented By: William Reid Pillifant
Represented By: Michael Joseph Lambert
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?