Shroyer v. Media Matters for America et al
Plaintiff: Jonathon Owen Shroyer
Defendant: Media Matters for America, Chloe Simon, Camden Carter, Salon.com, LLC and Amanda Marcotte
Case Number: 1:2025cv00164
Filed: February 4, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2025 Reset Answer Deadline: Salon.com, LLC answer due 5/5/2025. (cc3)
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Salon to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended by 46 days, up to and including May 5, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
March 21, 2025 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Camden Carter, Amanda Marcotte, and Chloe Simon. (cc3)
March 21, 2025 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jonathon Owen Shroyer. (Barnes, Robert)
March 20, 2025 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Salon.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Francis, Dwight)
February 25, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Media Matters for America and Salon.com, LLC. (cc3)
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jonathon Owen Shroyer. (Barnes, Robert)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LEXIS ANDERSON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert E. Barnes Lexis Anderson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19786767) by on behalf of Jonathon Owen Shroyer. (Barnes, Robert)
February 4, 2025 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
February 4, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
February 4, 2025 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jonathon Owen Shroyer. (kp)
February 4, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19749678), filed by Jonathon Owen Shroyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Retraction Demand to Media Matters, #3 Exhibit B - Second Retraction Demand to Media Matters, #4 Exhibit C - Retraction Demand to Salon)(Barnes, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shroyer v. Media Matters for America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Owen Shroyer
Represented By: Robert E. Barnes
Represented By: Lexis Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media Matters for America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chloe Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camden Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salon.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?