Techtronic Industries Company Limited v. Muddy Waters Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Techtronic Industries Company Limited
Defendant: Muddy Waters Capital LLC and MW Domino Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00249
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Reset Answer Deadlines: MW Domino Management LLC and Muddy Waters Capital LLC answer due 4/30/2025. (cc3)
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING the Unopposed #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Muddy Waters Capital LLC and MW Domino Management LLC's response to the complaint is due by April 30, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
March 20, 2025 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by MW Domino Management LLC, Muddy Waters Capital LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
March 14, 2025 Filing 21 Sealed Complaint filed by Plaintiff (cc3)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
March 13, 2025 Filing 19 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT, #3 Exhibit SEALED DOCUMENT) (Griffin, Asher)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KRISTIN TAHLER. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to LAURA FERGUSON. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
March 5, 2025 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin on behalf of Kristin Tahler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19872433) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Asher)
March 5, 2025 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin on behalf of Laura Ferguson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19871280) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Asher)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NICHOLAS INNS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JASON STERNBERG. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
March 4, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin Nicholas Inns ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19860808) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Asher)
March 3, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asher B. Griffin for Jason Sternberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19860266) by on behalf of Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Asher)
February 26, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. MW Domino Management LLC served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Griffin, Asher)
February 26, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. Muddy Waters Capital LLC served on 2/21/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (Griffin, Asher)
February 21, 2025 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MW Domino Management, LLC. (cc3)
February 21, 2025 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #3 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document The Court requires that the document(s) requested to be sealed be attached to the Motion for the Courts review. Please re-docket your motion using the Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
February 20, 2025 Filing 7 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (Griffin, Asher)
February 20, 2025 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. Corrected (Griffin, Asher)
February 20, 2025 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Muddy Waters Capital LLC. Clerk notes the duplicate requested summons was not issued. (kp)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Complaint: The Complaint you filed is deficient because the JS44 is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the JS44 using the event located at Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - JS44. This form is required for civil cases filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Griffin, Asher)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Techtronic Industries Company, Limited. (Griffin, Asher)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19816213), filed by Techtronic Industries Company, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Griffin, Asher)
February 20, 2025 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Techtronic Industries Company Limited. (kp)
February 20, 2025 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
February 20, 2025 Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Techtronic Industries Company Limited v. Muddy Waters Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Techtronic Industries Company Limited
Represented By: Asher B. Griffin
Represented By: Nicholas Inns
Represented By: Laura N. Ferguson
Represented By: Kristin Tahler
Represented By: Jason D. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muddy Waters Capital LLC
Represented By: Peter D. Kennedy
Represented By: James A. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW Domino Management LLC
Represented By: Peter D. Kennedy
Represented By: James A. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?