Bosse v. GEO Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Defendant: Mr. Hansen, GEO Group Medical, Mr. Higgins, GEO Group, Inc., Mr. FNU Hansen and Mr. FNU Higgins
Case Number: 2:2019cv00055
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Victor R Garcia
Referring Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt of #6 Order mailed to Michael Earl Bosse (ls)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Claim by Michael Earl Bosse.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #6 Order mailed to Michael Earl Bosse (ls)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE THAT CASE WILL BE ASSIGNED TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGEAND CONSENT FORM by Michael Earl Bosse (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed on Partial Payment of Court Fees by Michael Earl Bosse.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Michael Earl Bosse. (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Earl Bosse.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 - DUE) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44) #2 Exhibit M1, #3 Exhibit M2, #4 Exhibit M3, #5 Exhibit M4, #6 Exhibit M5, #7 Exhibit M6, #8 Exhibit M7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit M9, #11 Exhibit M10, #12 Exhibit M11, #13 Exhibit M12, #14 Exhibit M13, #15 Exhibit M14, #16 Exhibit M15, #17 Exhibit M16, #18 Exhibit M17, #20 Exhibit M18, #21 Exhibit M19, #22 Exhibit M20, #23 Exhibit M21, #24 Exhibit M22, #25 Exhibit M23, #26 Exhibit M24, #27 Exhibit M25, #28 Exhibit M26, #29 Exhibit M27, #30 Exhibit M28, #31 Exhibit M29, #32 Exhibit M30, #33 Exhibit M31, #34 Exhibit M32, #35 Exhibit M33, #36 Exhibit M34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit M36, #39 Exhibit M37, #40 Exhibit M38, #41 Exhibit M39 #42 Exhibit -) (ls).
September 4, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosse v. GEO Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Earl Bosse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?