Lundgren v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Lundgren
Defendant: Clifford Lundgren, Carl Lundgren, Shannon Clark and Daniel Clark
Case Number: 2:2021cv00001
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Victor R Garcia
Referring Judge: Alia Moses
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE-SETTING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 4/1/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (jaw)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RESETTING Status and Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia by video. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Byron L. Woolley on behalf of Brenda Lundgren. Attorney Byron L. Woolley added to party Brenda Lundgren(pty:pla) (Woolley, Byron)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph R. Ecke as to Brenda Lundgren.. Motions referred to Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RESETTING Video Scheduling and Status Conference for 2/16/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia: Pretrial Conference held on 2/2/2021 (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-C. Levrie.)(ls)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Mail RETURN Receipt of #2 Notice #4 Order #3 Order (ls)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Mailing of #2 Notice, #4 Order Setting, #3 Order to File Pro Hac Motion mailed to Attorney Joseph Ecke (ls)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Video Scheduling and Status Conference for 2/2/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Joseph Ecke to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 10 days. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES AVAILABILITY. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
January 19, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ls)
January 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ls)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Clifford Lundgren, Shannon Clark, Carl Lundgren (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14383252), filed by Clifford Lundgren, Shannon Clark, Carl Lundgren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B Application to Determine Heirship, #3 Exhibit C Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit D Defs Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit E Answer of Atty Ad Litem, #6 Exhibit F Agreed Temporary Injunction, #7 Exhibit G Plaintiff's Request for Disclosures, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundgren v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Lundgren
Represented By: J. Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Lundgren
Represented By: J. Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Clark
Represented By: J. Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lundgren
Represented By: Byron L. Woolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?