A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Defendant: A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc., Selective Insurance Company of America and Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00066
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alia Moses
Referring Judge: Collis White
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc.. (McNelis, Sean)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Litigation by Spencer Construction, LLC (Intervenor) and by Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Strey, Brandon)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc..(Strey, Brandon)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24 by Spencer Construction, LLC by Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Strey, Brandon)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Strey, Brandon)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (ls)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc.. (McNelis, Sean)
November 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ls)
November 19, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (ls)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15457394), filed by A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNelis, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Beck Foundation Co., Inc.
Represented By: Sean Brandon McNelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Eric Strey
Represented By: Tiffany Cox Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?