Le Thi Loan v. U.S.Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Le Thi Loan, successor in interest to Elizabeth Gutierrez Contreras and Le Thi Loan
Defendant: U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00310
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B. Assignment, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT - DEFENDANT'S REPORT ON PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Memorandum in Support filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support of #4 Order Subject Matter Jurisdiction by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Defendant to submit a memorandum of law addressing the Courts subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
October 19, 2018 Remark : All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (mn)
October 19, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11363608), filed by U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet A. Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement B. Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C. Case Summary/Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D. Original Petition, #5 Exhibit E. Civil Case Information Sheet, #6 Exhibit F. Original Answer, #7 Exhibit G. Property Description)(Hard-Wilson, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le Thi Loan v. U.S.Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Thi Loan, successor in interest to Elizabeth Gutierrez Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Thi Loan
Represented By: Omar Maynez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.Bank, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Beverly Mitrisin, As Trustee
Represented By: Brenda Hard-Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brenda Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Christopher Michael Boeck
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?