Yuengel v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.

Plaintiff: Mary Yuengel
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00355
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Receipt from District Court of El Paso County of re #9 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court (ar)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Remand to State Court Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Dore, Mark)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ 12(b)(6), #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mary Yuengel. (Valdez, John)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ 12(b)(6) by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all motions pending before thestate court, if any, are DENIED unless refiled in this Court.. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 AND LOCAL COURT RULE CV-16. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
November 19, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (jb)
November 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11469811), filed by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Dore, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuengel v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Yuengel
Represented By: John Paul Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?