Farah Aden v. Nielsen et al
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, Diane Witte and Matthew G. Whitaker
Petitioner: Abdinoor Farah Aden
Case Number: 3:2018cv00373
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker, Diane Witte, re #5 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Diane Witte, Defendant Matthew G. Whitaker, Defendant Kirstjen Nielsen Respondents' Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Romero, Manuel)
January 19, 2019 Filing 7 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Abdinoor Farah Aden, re #5 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant Diane Witte, Defendant Matthew G. Whitaker, Defendant Kirstjen Nielsen (Martinez, Emanuel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker, Diane Witte Amended (Romero, Manuel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Sealed Motion filed (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A) (lc3)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Respondents' MTD-MSJ, #2 Sealed Document 1, to Exhibit 1, to Respondents' MTD-MSJ) (Romero, Manuel)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker, Diane Witte. Show Cause Response due by 12/27/2018,. Signed by Judge David Briones. (ar)
December 7, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (jb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 300032959), filed by Abdinoor Farah Aden. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farah Aden v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Magdalena G. Jara
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Witte
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Manuel Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdinoor Farah Aden
Represented By: E. Anthony Martinez
Represented By: Emanuel Anthony Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?