Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. v. Huerta
Petitioner: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Respondent: Melissa Y Huerta and Melissa Y. Huerta
Case Number: 3:2018cv00392
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE pending the outcome of the Arbitration. Parties shall provide the Court with a Joint Status Report within 10 days of the Conclusion of the Arbitration. Parties shall move to Lift the Stay within 30 days after the conclusion of Arbitration. Case Administratively Closed. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent for Arbitration by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Walker, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. as to Melissa Y. Huerta. Waiver sent on 1/31/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Walker, Mark)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Melissa Y. Huerta. (bg2)
December 26, 2018 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (bg2)
December 26, 2018 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bg2)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bg2)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. with regard to Respondent Melissa Y. Huerta (Walker, Mark)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Arbitration and for Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11587506), filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mutual Arbitration Agreement Signed by Parties, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition Filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Complete Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Walker, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. v. Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Y Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Y. Huerta
Represented By: Oscar Mendez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. Walker
Represented By: Mario Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?