Iglesias v. Electrolux Home Care Products, LTD. et al

Plaintiff: sylvia iglesias
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Electrolux Home Care Products, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 1/31/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Jury Trial set for 1/31/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 8/12/2019, Plaintiffs Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2019, Discovery due by 8/12/2019, Defendants Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2019, Motions due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Sylvia Iglesias (Chavez, Enrique)
January 23, 2019 Remark: All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (mn)
January 23, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Amended by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McQueen, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11675630), filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet)(McQueen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iglesias v. Electrolux Home Care Products, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sylvia iglesias
Represented By: Michael Robert Anderson
Represented By: Enrique Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Care Products, LTD.
Represented By: Michael D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?