Escobar v. Modular Space Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Escobar
Defendant: Modular Space Corporation d/b/a Modspace, Willscot Equipment, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Willscot, Modular Space Corporation, and Modspace, Mitch Hardwick, Modular Space Corporation, Modspace and Wilscot Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00044
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Alberto Escobar, re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Alberto Escobar (Duke, Brett)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mitch Hardwick, Modspace, Modular Space Corporation(Individually, and), Modular Space Corporation, Wilscot Equipment, Inc., re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Alberto Escobar (DePonte, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Scheduling Order (JOINT) by Mitch Hardwick, Modspace, Modular Space Corporation(Individually, and), Modular Space Corporation, Wilscot Equipment, Inc.. (DePonte, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT [JOINT F.R.C.P. 26(f) REPORT] by Mitch Hardwick, Modspace, Modular Space Corporation(Individually, and), Modular Space Corporation, Wilscot Equipment, Inc.. (DePonte, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alberto Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duke, Brett)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/7/2019,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (mt)
February 4, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
February 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Willscot Equipment, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Willscot, Modular Space Corporation, and Modspace, Modular Space Corporation, Mitch Hardwick, Modular Space Corporation d/b/a Modspace (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11717753), filed by Willscot Equipment, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Willscot, Modular Space Corporation, and Modspace, Modular Space Corporation, Mitch Hardwick, Modular Space Corporation d/b/a Modspace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(DePonte, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. Modular Space Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modular Space Corporation d/b/a Modspace
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willscot Equipment, Inc., Individually and d/b/a Willscot, Modular Space Corporation, and Modspace
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Hardwick
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Represented By: Melanie E. Uremovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modular Space Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Represented By: Melanie E. Uremovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modspace
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Represented By: Melanie E. Uremovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilscot Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Represented By: Melanie E. Uremovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Escobar
Represented By: Daniela Labinoti
Represented By: Brett Allen Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?