Contreras v. Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ivette Contreras
Counter Plaintiff: Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc. and Rahim Peerbhai
Case Number: 3:2019cv00164
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, both parties ordered to jointly submit Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/9/2019, Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (mt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Marc James Wojciechowski added to party Rahim Peerbhai(pty:dft), Attorney Marc James Wojciechowski added to party Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Ivette Contreras by Rahim Peerbhai, Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc..(Wojciechowski, Marc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ivette Contreras as to All Defendants. (Loren, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rahim Peerbhai, Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc.. (mn)
June 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Ivette Contreras. (Loren, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ivette Contreras. (Loren, James)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12227295), filed by Ivette Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loren, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Remco Insurance Agencies, Inc.
Represented By: Marc James Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Rahim Peerbhai
Represented By: Marc James Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette Contreras
Represented By: James Mark Loren
Represented By: Rachael Victoria Rustmann
Represented By: George Zachary Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?