Patterson v. Becton, Dickinson & Co.
Plaintiff: Sandra Patterson
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson & Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00190
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned cause isDISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all settings in this matter are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this cause, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #11 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Becton, Dickinson & Co. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all settings in this matter are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this cause, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. FINALLY, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall CLOSE this case.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Becton, Dickinson & Co.. (McCrory, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by Becton, Dickinson & Co. (McCrory, Sean)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance by Sandra Patterson (Vielledent, Ricardo)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATIVE TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff prepare a Final Judgment, Non-Suit, Stipulation of Dismissal, or any other appropriate document disposing of the above-styled and numbered cause in its entirety, and that counsel for Plaintiff forward such documents tocounsel for Defendant for approval as to form by no later than August 19,2019, with notice of compliance filed in the above-captioned cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant act upon the document and return it to counsel for Plaintiff, forwarding said document by no later than August 26, 2019, with notice of compliance also filed in the above-captioned cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff ensure that the document with all required signatures be presented to the Court for signature and entry no later than September 3, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. Mountain Time. ON THE DATE OF September 10, 2019, failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of the case unless the time periods set forth herein are extended by Court Order.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Becton, Dickinson & Co. (McCrory, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Becton, Dickinson & Co. RETAIN local counsel as soon as possible, but in no event later than August 12, 2019.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Plaintiff and Defendant Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 8/12/2019Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER TO REPLEAD IN REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
July 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (mn)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Becton, Dickinson & Co.. (McCrory, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal by Becton, Dickinson & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s (1-5) APP. 0000001 through APP. 0000021)(McCrory, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Becton, Dickinson & Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12337656), filed by Becton, Dickinson & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(McCrory, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Becton, Dickinson & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson & Co.
Represented By: Sean M. McCrory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Patterson
Represented By: Ricardo E. Vielledent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?