Acosta v. Sumerian Enterprises LLC d/b/a Back Nine, et al.
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Sumerian Enterprises LLC dba Back Nine, Justin Kaufman and Sumerian Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Michael D. McQueen added to party Justin Kaufman(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D. McQueen added to party Sumerian Enterprises LLC(pty:dft) by Justin Kaufman, Sumerian Enterprises LLC.(McQueen, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta as to Justin Kaufman. Waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Silversmith, Summer)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta as to Sumerian Enterprises LLC. Waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Silversmith, Summer)
July 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silversmith, Summer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Sumerian Enterprises LLC d/b/a Back Nine, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumerian Enterprises LLC dba Back Nine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kaufman
Represented By: Michael D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumerian Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Michael D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Summer Christine Silversmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?