Federal Trade Commission et al v. Madera Merchant Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of Ohio ex rel. Attorney General Dave Yost and Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Victor Rodriguez, Bruce Woods, Madera Merchant Services, LLC and B&P Enterprises, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Susan M. Forbes
Case Number: 3:2019cv00195
Filed: July 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Pursuant to the Court's Order, the Seal in this case has been lifted. (mm1)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Receiver's BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Susan M. Forbes. (mn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter. (mn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF.(mn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Ex Parte Motion Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document) (mn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #2 Exhibit) (mn).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Ex Parte Motion Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED EX PARTE MOTION (mn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Sealed Motion Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Christopher E. Brown may appear on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission pro hac vice in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #1 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that J. Ronald Brooke, Jr. may appear on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission pro hac vice in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to B&P Enterprises, LLC, Madera Merchant Services, LLC, Victor Rodriguez, Bruce Woods. (scf)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document, #5 Sealed Document, #6 Sealed Document, #7 Sealed Document, #8 Sealed Document, #9 Sealed Document, #10 Sealed Document, #11 Sealed Document, #12 Sealed Document, #13 Sealed Document, #14 Sealed Document) (scf)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher E. Brown by on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm1)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Ronald Brooke, Jr by on behalf of Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mm1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Madera Merchant Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera Merchant Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&P Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Susan M. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio ex rel. Attorney General Dave Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Christopher E. Brown
Represented By: J. Ronald Brooke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?