Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC et al v. Burrup
Plaintiff: Jerry Reiner and Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC
Defendant: David Justin Burrup
Case Number: 3:2019cv00197
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 8/28/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Status Conference set for 8/20/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 4/16/2020, Plaintiffs Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2020, Defendants Joinder of Parties due by 1/13/2020,Defendants Amended Pleadings due by 1/27/2020, Discovery due by 3/16/2020, Motions due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by Jerry Reiner, Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC. (Miranda, Carlos)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for the parties to meet, confer, and submit a joint report ofparties planning meeting as specified in the Courts Standing Order on Pretrial Deadlines no later than September 11, 2019 Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mn)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that complete diversity exists in this case. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Citizenship by David Justin Burrup re #3 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Metzler, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Statement of Citizenship by Jerry Reiner, Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC re #3 Order (Miranda, Carlos)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Defendant to FILE a written notice identifying his and Jerry Rainers citizenship, as well as each of the members of Summit Mountain Ranch,LLC and their citizenship, on or before August 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
July 19, 2019 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Kathleen Cardone located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (scf)
July 19, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (scf)
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by David Justin Burrup. (Metzler, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Justin Burrup (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12371344), filed by David Justin Burrup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Certified State Court Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement)(Metzler, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC et al v. Burrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Reiner
Represented By: Carlos A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Mountain Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Carlos A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Justin Burrup
Represented By: David J. Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?