Taylor v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Taylor
Defendant: FCA US LLC and EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00208
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #15 Response to Motion, #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #20 Notice (Other) by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, George)
September 17, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections to #21 Notice of Filing by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sonnier, George)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Untimely Evidence in opposition to Motion to Remand by Steven Taylor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Labinoti, Daniela)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Clerical Error re Exhibits: Affidavits of Ivan Ochoa and Gerardo Gandarilla by FCA US LLC re #15 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sonnier, George)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Steven Taylor, re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Steven Taylor Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing in Support of and Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion to Remand (Labinoti, Daniela)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan C. Bueche on behalf of EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER, FCA US LLC. Attorney Ryan C. Bueche added to party EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan C. Bueche added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (Bueche, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER, FCA US LLC amending, filed by Steven Taylor.(jg1)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Amend Complaint Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by FCA US LLC, re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Steven Taylor (jg1)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney George Robert Sonnier,Carlos Rincon for EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response in Opposition, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Linit, #3 Proposed Order er Plts Motion to Remand)(Sonnier, George)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by FCA US LLC, re #7 MOTION to Amend Complaint Plaintiff's Opposed Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Taylor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sonnier, George)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order [AGREED] by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, George)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sonnier, George)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Steven Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Labinoti, Daniela)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint Plaintiff's Opposed Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint by Steven Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Labinoti, Daniela)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to the Record Upon Removal by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Order of Substitution of Counsel for Def. El Paso Auto Acquisitions Inc.)(Sonnier, George)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/30/2019,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
July 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mn)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, George)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, George)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC. (Sonnier, George)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12401106), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Sonnier, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: George Robert Sonnier
Represented By: Ryan C. Bueche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL PASO AUTO ACQUISITIONS INC., dba SUNLAND PARK CHRYSLER
Represented By: Susan G. White
Represented By: Brandon Lee Starling
Represented By: Carlos Rincon
Represented By: Ramon Benavides, III
Represented By: Ryan C. Bueche
Represented By: George Robert Sonnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Taylor
Represented By: Ramon Benavides, III
Represented By: Daniela Labinoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?