Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V. et al v. Michael W. Surratt, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Director de Compras Javier Paniagua and Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: Sun Valley Pecan Company
Counter Plaintiff: Michael W. Surratt, Inc. and Sun Valley Pecan Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V., Javier Paniagua. (Davis, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO COMPLY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 AND LOCAL COURT RULE CV-16. Signed by Judge David Briones. (mv)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Michael W. Surratt, Inc., Sun Valley Pecan Company. (Hall, Bryan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Bryan Harris Hall added to party Michael W. Surratt, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Harris Hall added to party Sun Valley Pecan Company(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Sun Valley Pecan Company, Michael W. Surratt, Inc..(Hall, Bryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V., Javier Paniagua. Sun Valley Pecan Company served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V., Javier Paniagua. Michael W. Surratt, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V., Javier Paniagua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addt'l. Summons)(Davis, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12512858), filed by Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V., Javier Paniagua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A and B)(Davis, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (jg1)
August 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V. et al v. Michael W. Surratt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Michael W. Surratt, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Harris Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Sun Valley Pecan Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Harris Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Valley Pecan Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Director de Compras Javier Paniagua
Represented By: Joseph M. Davis
Represented By: Daniel Salvador Gonzalez
Represented By: Clinton Lee Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agro Exim Alpari, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Joseph M. Davis
Represented By: Daniel Salvador Gonzalez
Represented By: Clinton Lee Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?