Acosta v. Odle Management Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Ramon Acosta
Defendant: Odle Management Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00265
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 ADR Report Filed - Parties' Alternative Dispute Resolution Report by Odle Management Group, LLC(DePonte, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip R. Martinez: Docket Call held on 11/7/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Walter Chiriboga.)(dt)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/2/2020 09:00AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, Jury Trial set for 10/2/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/4/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2019, Discovery due by 5/4/2020, Motions due by 6/4/2020,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Odle Management Group, LLC. (DePonte, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Report by Odle Management Group, LLC. (DePonte, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Odle Management Group, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Odle Management Group, LLC Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Exhibit Ex E, #6 Exhibit Ex F, #7 Exhibit Ex G)(DePonte, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/28/2019) (dt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 10/28/2019) (dt).
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Odle Management Group, LLC.(DePonte, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ramon Acosta, re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Odle Management Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chavez, Enrique)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Morgan Broaddus, III on behalf of Odle Management Group, LLC. Attorney J. Morgan Broaddus, III added to party Odle Management Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Broaddus, J.)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's deadline to file his response to defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration is October 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Brief, #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Ramon Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chavez, Enrique)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Odle Management Group, LLC amending, filed by Ramon Acosta.(Chavez, Enrique)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DOCKET CALL, ( Docket Call set for 11/7/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Philip R. Martinez,). Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF regarding #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Odle Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(DePonte, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Odle Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DePonte, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report. Plaintiff and Defendant Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Case Management Report due by 11/4/2019,. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Odle Management Group RETAIN local counsel as soon as possible, but in no event later than October 18, 2019.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER TO REPLEAD IN REMOVED CASES.. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
September 16, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (scf)
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelby M. Broaddus on behalf of Odle Management Group, LLC. Attorney Shelby M. Broaddus added to party Odle Management Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Broaddus, Shelby)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Odle Management Group, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12612608), filed by Odle Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(DePonte, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Odle Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odle Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Represented By: Shelby M. Broaddus
Represented By: J. Morgan Broaddus, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Acosta
Represented By: Michael Robert Anderson
Represented By: Enrique Chavez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?