Betancourt v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Pedro Betancourt
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC and Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00307
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Briones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC Certificate of Written Discovery (Enriquez, Laura)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Betancourt Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Chaparro, Daisy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pedro Betancourt (Chaparro, Daisy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Agreed Selection of Christopher A. Antcliff as Neutral, filed by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC.(Enriquez, Laura)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC Certificate of Written Discovery (Enriquez, Laura)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 COURTROOM PROTOCOL (lc3)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/27/2020 09:00AM before Judge David Briones, Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 09:00 AM before Judge David Briones, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/10/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2020, Discovery due by 8/20/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 1/9/2020, Motions due by 9/17/2020,. Signed by Judge David Briones. (lc3)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Recommendations Discovery Plan by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC. (Enriquez, Laura)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Proposed Scheduling Order by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC (Enriquez, Laura)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER To Comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 and Local Court Rule CV-16.. Signed by Judge David Briones. (mm1)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying all motions pending before the State Court, if any.. Signed by Judge David Briones. (mm1)
October 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12757673), filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement)(Enriquez, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betancourt v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Betancourt
Represented By: Daisy Chaparro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Laura Enriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Laura Enriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?