Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mark Williams
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00309
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff Mark Williams against Defendants C.R. Bard Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS MOREOVER ORDERED that the District Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
December 14, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Matthews, Melissa)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing parties to file dismissal papers within 30 days and setting docket call; ( Docket Call set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM before Judge David C Guaderrama,). Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Matthews, Melissa)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND REOUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT REPORT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties SHALL JOINTLY FILE by December 20, 2019, a status report providing updates on all remaining case-specific discovery and other pretrial issues. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties SHALL CONFER and ATTACH a Joint Report outlining their discovery plan and proposed scheduling order as required by Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(f) and Local Court Rule CV-16(c). Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em) Modified on 11/22/2019 (em).
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T. Lucky on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lucky, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T. Lucky on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lucky, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T. Lucky on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Jeffrey T. Lucky added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey T. Lucky added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Lucky, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Mark Williams and Defendants C.R. Bard Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., SHALL RETAIN local counsel as soon as possible, but in no event later than December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Richard B. North, Jr. of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, Atlantic Station, 201 17th St. NW, Suite 1700, Atlanta, GA 30363, is hereby withdrawn as attorney of record for Defendants. entered by Judge David C Guaderrama. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(pc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matthews, Melissa)
October 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
October 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Dorman Matthews on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Matthews, Melissa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03281.
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3281-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16933640 filed by Mark Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Helm
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Lucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Helm
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Lucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Williams
Represented By: Scott R Seideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?