Paige v. AM Hospice, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrea Procter Paige
Defendant: AM Hospice, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00319
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Andrea Procter Paige, re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant AM Hospice, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chavez, Enrique)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AM Hospice, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Robert)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Service returned by Andrea Procter Paige. AM Hospice, Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Chavez, Enrique)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AM Hospice, Inc.. (dt)
November 4, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (scf)
November 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (scf)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Andrea Procter Paige. Summons in a Civil Action (Chavez, Enrique)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12804346), filed by Andrea Procter Paige. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chavez, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paige v. AM Hospice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Procter Paige
Represented By: Enrique Chavez, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Hospice, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?