Lewis v. Veterans Affairs Healthcare System et al
Plaintiff: Brian Jaffe Lewis
Defendant: Dr Edward Leyua, Veterans Affairs Healthcare System and Well-med Manage Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00035
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Frank Montalvo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/27/2020. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
March 24, 2020 Filing 43 Original ANSWER to #29 Complaint by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System.(Hines, Natashia)
March 11, 2020 Filing 42 Dr. Edward Leyva's ANSWER to #29 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Mark A. Bracken added to party Edward Leyua(pty:dft) by Edward Leyua.(Bracken, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing 41 Certified Mailing of #38 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (fm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 40 Certified Mail Receipt of #36 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (fm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to #29 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Well-med Manage Company.(Trevino, Andrew)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Veterans Affairs Healthcare System-El Paso answer due 3/26/2020. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
March 6, 2020 Filing 37 Certified Mailing of #36 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (fm)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew P Trevino for Well-med Manage Company. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
March 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordan S. O'Donnell of Andrew P. Trevino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13290798) by on behalf of Well-med Manage Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Jordan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan S. O'Donnell on behalf of Well-med Manage Company. Attorney Jordan S. O'Donnell added to party Well-med Manage Company(pty:dft) (O'Donnell, Jordan)
March 3, 2020 Filing 33 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #29 Complaint by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System. (Hines, Natashia)
March 2, 2020 Filing 32 Certified Mailing of #20 Order Denying Motions to Dismiss (fm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Substitute Attorney. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Paul M. Bracken, Noel R. Gattis, and the firm of Robles,Bracken, & Hughes PLLC are substituted as counsel of record for Dr. Edward Leyva. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
February 20, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE Amended Notice of Substitution by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System re #28 Notice of Filing (Hines, Natashia)
February 20, 2020 Filing 29 COMPLAINT filed by Brian Jaffe Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Change of Address)(mt)
February 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Substitution of Assistant United States Attorney by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System (Jara, Magdalena) Modified on 2/20/2020 (em).
February 20, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Edward Leyua. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bracken, Paul)
February 12, 2020 Filing 26 Certified Mailing of #20 Order Denying Motions to Dismiss as Moot (fm)
February 12, 2020 Filing 25 Certified Mailing of #20 Order Denying Motions to Dismiss as Moot (fm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 24 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Linda Vogt Meagher. (fm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 23 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Katharine H. Campbell. (fm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 22 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Michael P. Malone. (fm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Attorney Andrew P. Trevino. (fm)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying Motions to Dismiss as Moot and Ordering Plaintiff to File Notice of Intent to Prosecute re: MOOTING #5 Motion ; MOOTING #10 Motion to Dismiss ; MOOTING #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (fm)
February 6, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mn)
February 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Wisconsin; Case Number 2:19-cv-00667.
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/5/2020. #7 Defendant Veterans Affairs Healthcare System-El Paso's motion to transfer venue GRANTED; Clerk of Court to transfer case to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Brian Lewis)(cb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P Trevino on behalf of Well-med Manage Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew P. Trevino (Trevino, Andrew) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Joe Zimmerman in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Malone, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 APPENDIX by Well-med Manage Company re Index of Unpublished Authorities. (Malone, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Well-med Manage Company re #13 MOTION to Dismiss . (Malone, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Well-med Manage Company. (Malone, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Malone on behalf of Well-med Manage Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael P. Malone (Malone, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by Edward Leyua re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)2, 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Dr. Edward Leyva)(Meagher, Linda) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)2, 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) by Edward Leyua. (Meagher, Linda) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guadagnino, Charles) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guadagnino, Charles) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Texas by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System. (Guadagnino, Charles) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Veterans Affairs Healthcare System. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guadagnino, Charles) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Set Deadline for Defendant Leyva's Response to Complaint by Edward Leyua. (Meagher, Linda) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Vogt Meagher on behalf of Edward Leyua. Attorney(s) appearing: Linda V. Meagher, Katharine H. Campbell (Meagher, Linda) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brian Jaffe Lewis. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (also enclosed service packets (3), consent/refusal forms(3), and pro se guide). (ds) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brian Jaffe Lewis. (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689077711) (ds) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 2/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Veterans Affairs Healthcare System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Edward Leyua
Represented By: Linda Vogt Meagher
Represented By: Katharine H Campbell
Represented By: Noel Richard Gattis
Represented By: Paul M. Bracken
Represented By: Mark A. Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs Healthcare System
Represented By: Charles A Guadagnino
Represented By: Natashia Denise Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well-med Manage Company
Represented By: Michael P Malone
Represented By: Andrew P Trevino
Represented By: Jordan S. O'Donnell
Represented By: Andrew P. Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Jaffe Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?