Carrillo v. ROICOM USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Blanca Carrillo
Defendant: ROICOM USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00147
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Anne T Berton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 8/7/2020,. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (lc3)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Mark D. Dore added to party ROICOM USA, LLC(pty:dft) by ROICOM USA, LLC.(Dore, Mark)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanca Carrillo. ROICOM USA, LLC served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Coyle, Lynn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROICOM USA, LLC. (jg1)
May 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Anne T. Berton. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Blanca Carrillo. (Coyle, Lynn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13595476), filed by Blanca Carrillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coyle, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo v. ROICOM USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Carrillo
Represented By: Lynn A. Coyle
Represented By: Christopher Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROICOM USA, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?