Edmond v. Marathon Petroleum Company, LP
Plaintiff: Jerome Edmond
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company, LP and Cardinal Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00210
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP (Ray, Jeff)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jerome Edmond, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Ray, Jeff)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Ray, Jeff)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Ray, Jeff)
July 20, 2020 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (em)
July 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (jg1)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13772969), filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2-Plf Orig Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4-Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5-Affidavit of Service on Marathon, #6 Exhibit 6-Citation Cardinal, #7 Exhibit 7-Citation Marathon, #8 Exhibit 8-JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit 9-Supp to JS44)(Ray, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmond v. Marathon Petroleum Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company, LP
Represented By: Jeff H. Ray
Represented By: Robert Lee Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Edmond
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?