United States Of America v. 2007 Jeep Wrangler et al
Petitioner: United States Of America
Respondent: 2012 Ford F-150, 2019 Chevrolet Camaro, 2007 Jeep Wrangler, Real Property and 2017 Honda Accord
Case Number: 3:2021cv00005
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Referring Judge: Philip R Martinez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Stay Case. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all proceedings applicable to all parties in the instant civil forfeiture case are STAYED until the disposition of the underlying criminal investigation isconcluded. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone for all proceedings. Judge Philip R. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wade, Kristal)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (dt)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest of Property Issued for Property (mt)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO POST NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE OF RESPONDANT REAL PROPERTY AND FOR NOTICE. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (dt)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING 2 Ex Parte Motion entered by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (oa)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Order for Warrant, #3 Warrant, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice of Complaint)(mn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. 2007 Jeep Wrangler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 2012 Ford F-150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 2019 Chevrolet Camaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 2007 Jeep Wrangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Real Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 2017 Honda Accord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Of America
Represented By: Kristal Melisa Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?