Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Fountain of Youth Lounge LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Houman Ebrahimi, Kambiz Sadraei and Fountain of Youth Lounge LLC d/b/a Fountain of Youth
Case Number: 3:2021cv00040
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE; IT IS ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action against Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the District Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (em)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Houman Ebrahimi, Kambiz Sadraei. (em)
February 24, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge David C. Guaderrama located at http://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/Rules/StandingOrders/default.asp#elpaso (em)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fountain of Youth Lounge LLC. (em)
February 23, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (em)
February 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge David C Guaderrama. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (em)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14513505), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Fountain of Youth Lounge LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houman Ebrahimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kambiz Sadraei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fountain of Youth Lounge LLC d/b/a Fountain of Youth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?