Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. BC Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: BC/Oasis Holding, LLC, Angel Salvador Romo, BC Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Oasis Lanes, d/b/a Oasis Lanes and Amusement Center, and d/b/a Frankie's Bar and Michael M. Miles
Case Number: 3:2021cv00041
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Guaderrama
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REQUEST ENTRY OF DEFENDANTS DEFAULT by no later than April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (mc4)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. BC/Oasis Holding, LLC served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (King, Jamie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. BC Entertainment, LLC served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (King, Jamie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Michael M. Miles served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (King, Jamie)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Angel Salvador Romo served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (King, Jamie)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David C Guaderrama for all proceedings. Judge Philip R. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BC Entertainment, LLC, BC/Oasis Holding, LLC, Michael M. Miles, Angel Salvador Romo. (em)
February 23, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (em)
February 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Philip R. Martinez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (em)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14516248), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. BC Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC/Oasis Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Salvador Romo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC Entertainment, LLC d/b/a Oasis Lanes, d/b/a Oasis Lanes and Amusement Center, and d/b/a Frankie's Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?