Quintero Rios v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Steve Enrique Quintero Rios
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00235
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Mail Delivery Receipt of #2 Order (dt)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Tadema on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin. Attorney Nathan Tadema added to party Bobby Lumpkin(pty:res) (Tadema, Nathan)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Certified Mailing of #2 Order (dt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Fed Ex Delivery Receipt of #6 Certified Mail Receipt (dt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 FedEx Mailing of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steve Enrique Quintero Rios.(dc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 Fed Ex Mail Receipt of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (dt)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR RESPONDENT TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steve Enrique Quintero Rios. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of H.C. under 28:2254)(dt)
September 27, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero Rios v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Enrique Quintero Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Represented By: Nathan Tadema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?