Mesa Motors, LLC v. Backlotcars, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mesa Motors, LLC
Defendant: Backlotcars, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00166
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kathleen Cardone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed by 2/3/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2022, Discovery due by 1/3/2023, Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2022, Motions due by 2/3/2023,. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 6/30/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Jury Trial set for 6/30/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone, Status Conference set for 6/22/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
July 5, 2022 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Amended Report of Parties by Mesa Motors, LLC. (Maldonado, Carlos)
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mesa Motors, LLC. (Maldonado, Carlos)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT ON PRETRIAL DEADLINES.. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Backlotcars, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Backlotcars, Inc..(Karp, Daniel)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUESTING WRITTEN NOTICE. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (dt)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of List of Involved Attorneys by Backlotcars, Inc. (Karp, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Index of Pleadings filed in the State Court by Backlotcars, Inc. (Karp, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Backlotcars, Inc.. (Karp, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Backlotcars, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-16019855), filed by Backlotcars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Karp, Daniel)
May 11, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dt)
May 11, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesa Motors, LLC v. Backlotcars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mesa Motors, LLC
Represented By: Carlos Gustavo Maldonado
Represented By: Carlos A. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backlotcars, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?